Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023