Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1275 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 6, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023