|
06/22/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-285
|
|
|
|
06/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1256
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 98, NAYS 16
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|