Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1281 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 26, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 15, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023