House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee(Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|