House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1190 (Ch. 2023-255)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|