Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1337 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 23, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023