Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 25, 2023