House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in returning Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Requested House to recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Refused to concur in amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (229727)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Concurred in Senate amendment 645914 as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment 229727 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (645914)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 107, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Amendment 053353 adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Amendment 448169 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Amendment 440347 adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Amendment 519533 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee(Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
PCS added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|