Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1343 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023