Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1357 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023