Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1517 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 16, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023