|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-73
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 926
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Original reference removed: Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Original reference removed: Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
PCS added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|