Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1597 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 27, 2023