LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
H7001
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H7001
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H7001
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 26, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
June 1, 2023
Analysis
May 10, 2023
Analysis
March 14, 2023
Analysis
March 10, 2023
Analysis
March 7, 2023
Analysis
March 3, 2023