House | 05/01/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7022 (Ch. 2023-61) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Favorable by Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Now in Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |