|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-132
|
|
|
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Substituted for HB 117
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/23/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/15/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/07/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/20/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|