Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0218 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023