|
06/16/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-249
|
|
|
|
06/16/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (644029)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 644029 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|