LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0538
Compare Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0538
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0538
Compare Versions
S0538 Enrolled May 4, 2023
S0538 Engrossed May 3, 2023
S0538 Comm Sub March 22, 2023
S0538 Comm Sub March 7, 2023
S0538 Introduced February 6, 2023
Version 1 (Old)
S0538 Enrolled May 4, 2023
S0538 Engrossed May 3, 2023
S0538 Comm Sub March 22, 2023
S0538 Comm Sub March 7, 2023
S0538 Introduced February 6, 2023
Version 2 (New)
Compare