Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0538 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 22, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023