|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-137
|
|
|
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 1071
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|