Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1068 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023