LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S1068
Compare Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S1068
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1068
Compare Versions
S1068 Enrolled April 27, 2023
S1068 Comm Sub April 6, 2023
S1068 Comm Sub March 24, 2023
S1068 Comm Sub March 15, 2023
S1068 Introduced February 22, 2023
Version 1 (Old)
S1068 Enrolled April 27, 2023
S1068 Comm Sub April 6, 2023
S1068 Comm Sub March 24, 2023
S1068 Comm Sub March 15, 2023
S1068 Introduced February 22, 2023
Version 2 (New)
Compare