Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Filed |