Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1108 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023