Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1252 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023