House
|
07/10/2024
|
Veto Message received
|
|
|
|
06/21/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Substituted for SB 258
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 3
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|