Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0317 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2024
Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024
Analysis December 7, 2023
Analysis December 5, 2023