Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0353 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024