|
06/28/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-270
|
|
|
|
06/27/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 434
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 108, NAYS 6
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment 468371 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
PCS added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|