Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0403 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis July 9, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 26, 2024