House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Favorable by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Filed |