House | 03/05/2024 | Laid on Table | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Favorable by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/16/2023 | Filed |