Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0517 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024