Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0523 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 14, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024