Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 98, NAYS 15
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment 628365 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|