Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0531 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024
Analysis December 12, 2023
Analysis December 5, 2023