Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0551 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis December 14, 2023
Analysis December 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024
Bill December 14, 2023