House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
PCS added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|