Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0569 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024
Bill January 12, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024