|
03/28/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-45
|
|
|
|
03/28/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/21/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1134
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|