Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0583 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 2, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024