|
04/08/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-66
|
|
|
|
04/05/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/27/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 554
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|