Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0591 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 9, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024