Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0691 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis July 3, 2024
Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024