House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|