House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|