Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0769 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024