House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|